DR RADCLIFFE'S ALMSHOUSES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of accommodation to elderly persons
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 12 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Boobyer | Trustee | 15 February 2025 |
|
|
||||
Caroline Ann Parsons | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Vaughan Key Billings | Trustee | 22 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rev Harriet Orridge | Trustee | 11 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Alan Peckham | Trustee | 01 January 2014 |
|
|||||
RICHARD PRESTON | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.49k | £7.67k | £8.06k | £8.77k | £9.03k | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.88k | £5.71k | £6.52k | £5.24k | £44.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 26 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 18 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 21 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 21 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 28TH NOVEMBER 1973, AS AMENDED ON THE 11TH MARCH 1993 BY A RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER THE PROVISIONS OF SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO (EXCEPT IN SPECIAL CASES TO BE APPROVED BY THE COMMISSIONERS) ARE RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF STEEPLE ASTON AND MIDDLE ASTON AT THE TIME OF APPOINTMENT.
Area of benefit
STEEPLE ASTON AND MIDDLE ASTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
Holly Cottage
Middle Aston
Bicester
OX25 5PZ
- Phone:
- 01869340647
- Email:
- matters@middleaston.org.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window