FREE GARDENS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Upkeep of Free Gardens. Needy causes within the Parish Proportion as agreed by the Trustees annually to use only the interest generated from the capital sum, towards the Parish Precept
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 19 September 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Brian Phillips | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hywel Evans | Trustee | 10 February 2024 |
|
|
||||
Trevor Harrison | Trustee | 10 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Humphrey Gravell | Trustee | 01 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
David Todd | Trustee | 01 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Toby Russell Sturgis | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
John Harper | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Barker | Trustee | 06 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Meriel Matear Griffiths | Trustee | 06 June 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.93k | £1.97k | £2.22k | £2.26k | £2.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.59k | £3.02k | £1.57k | £2.33k | £4.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 February 2025 | 6 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 16 February 2024 | 11 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 17 March 2023 | 40 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 18 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 19 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME
Charitable objects
ALLOTMENTS FOR THE POOR AND ANY SURPLUS INCOME TO BE USED FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALLOTMENT HOLDERS OR IN THE EVENT OF THERE BEING NO ALLOTMENT HOLDERS FOR THE BENEFIT OF PERSONS QUALIFIED TO BE ALLOTMENT HOLDERS. IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE CLEAR YEARLY INCOME OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED CHARITY IS NOT REQUIRED FOR APPLICATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE PROVISIONS OF THE ABOVE-MENTIONED SCHEME OF THE 24TH MAY 1960 THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY MAY APPLY THE SAME FOR THE RELIEF GENERALLY OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF GREAT SOMERFORD WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS AND SUBJECT THERETO FOR CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE SAID PARISH.
Area of benefit
GREAT SOMERFORD
Contact information
- Address:
-
Ladys Walk
West Street
Great Somerford
CHIPPENHAM
Wiltshire
SN15 5EH
- Phone:
- 07884494178
- Email:
- JHarper@higcapital.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window