REDCLIFFE PARISH CHARITY
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We make grants to individuals via a third party (ie Social Services, Housing Assoc etc) (excludes loans, college/school fees, recurring outgoings).
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bristol City
Governance
- 12 April 1962: Standard registration
- 11 November 2024: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 11 November 2024: Funds transferred to 1080418 QUARTET COMMUNITY FOUNDATION
- THE REDCLIFFE PARISH CHARITY (Working name)
- THE TEMPLE ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES (Previous name)
- THE TEMPLE ELLEEMOSYNARY CHARITIES (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.01k | £7.63k | £18.95k | £7.12k | £16.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £8.47k | £9.80k | £12.15k | £7.16k | £15.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 29 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 10 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 01 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 16 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 28 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 13 MAY 1986 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME SEALED 3 JULY 1996 AND RESOLUTION PASSED 1/8/96, AS AMENDED 5 MARCH 1997 AND 7 MAY 2008
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE CITY OF BRISTOL WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS WITH A PREFERENCE FOR SUCH PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY REDCLIFFE WITH TEMPLE,BRISTOL AAND ST JOHN THE BAPTIST,BEDMINSTER
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window