D C MONCRIEFF CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 203919
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Making of grants to other registered charities as the trustees shall in their uncontrolled discretion from time to time determine. An emphasis is placed on charities within the local area of Norfolk and Suffolk.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024

Total income: £58,998
Total expenditure: £65,558

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 May 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Trust
Other names:
  • D C MONCRIEFF CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Risk management
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MARTIN FRANCIS GERARD DUNNE Chair
THE COMPASS SUITE LTD
Charity reporting is overdue by 295 days
Linda Friston Trustee 11 March 2020
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARGARET LOWESTOFT
Received: On time
Brian Routledge Trustee 19 June 2014
None on record
MARK IAN WILLIS Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £60.05k £49.35k £55.46k £53.78k £59.00k
Total expenditure £78.10k £3.49k £91.84k £67.27k £65.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 05 April 2024 19 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2024 19 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2023 01 February 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2022 10 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2022 10 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2021 13 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 05 April 2020 05 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
8 Quinnell Way
LOWESTOFT
NR32 4WL
Phone:
07854656682
Website:

No information available