Linked charities THE FRANK AND GEORGE SIMPSON AND DR RABY TRUST FUND
Charity number: 203927
Removed charity
Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 2.2.1923 AND 19.9.1946 AS AMENDED ON 14.8.1957
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE BOROUGH OF DEVIZES, PARTICULARLY FOR THE PROVISION OF EXTRA COMFORTS FOR YOUNG CHILDREN AND THE AGED.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF DEVIZES
Registration history
- 12 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 25 August 1995 : Removed
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.