Trustees THE GRESHAM WELLS TRUST
Charity number: 203938

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Deborah Ann Watson | Trustee | 21 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Ian Andrews | Trustee | 18 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neil Brian Green | Trustee | 17 May 2022 |
|
|||||
John Mark O'Connell | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Karen Jane Saunders | Trustee | 19 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Strange | Trustee | 29 July 2014 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINE NUGENT | Trustee |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.