HOCKWORTHY VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Hockworthy Village Hall was placed into Trust for the benefit of the village in 1953 with the objective of providing "recreation rooms and a centre in which the social, moral and intellectual life of the inhabitants of the Parish of Hockworthy without distinction of sex or of political, religious or other opinions find means and opportunity for development".
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 23 May 2024
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Devon
Governance
- 02 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emily Hooper | Trustee | 24 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Potter | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Bates | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Ian David Long | Trustee | 01 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
HILARY CORCORAN | Trustee | 23 May 2015 |
|
|||||
Richard Maltby | Trustee | 09 December 2013 |
|
|
||||
JACQUELINE SIMONS | Trustee | 14 January 2013 |
|
|
||||
KATHERINE LORNA BRITTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD HUGHES | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 23/05/2020 | 23/05/2021 | 23/05/2022 | 23/05/2023 | 23/05/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.05k | £21.38k | £12.49k | £12.51k | £4.69k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.77k | £2.51k | £10.34k | £8.70k | £23.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.57k | £10.67k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 23 May 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2023 | 08 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2021 | 12 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 23 May 2020 | 19 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 23 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE DATED 27TH SEPTEMBER, 1953.
Charitable objects
A CENTRE FOR THE DEVELOPMENT OF "THE SOCIAL, MORAL ND INTELLECTUAL LIFE OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH OF HOCKWORTHY."
Area of benefit
PARISH OF HOCKWORTHY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
HURDS FARM
HOCKWORTHY
WELLINGTON
TA21 0NW
- Phone:
- 01823672182
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window