ALBERT JOHN TOOGOOD WILL TRUST

Charity number: 203954
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Action for the blind, the children

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 07 April 2024

Total income: £1,577
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 March 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

1 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
LLOYDS TSB BANK PLC Trustee 23 November 2011
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/04/2020 07/04/2021 07/04/2022 07/04/2023 07/04/2024
Total gross income £1.37k £1.23k £1.08k £1.31k £1.58k
Total expenditure £1.27k £1.37k £2.32k £1.31k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 April 2024 13 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2024 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2023 07 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2022 10 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2021 09 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 April 2020 30 December 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 April 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Lloyds Banking Group
City Park
The Droveway
HOVE
East Sussex
BN3 7AU
Phone:
0345 300 0304
Website:

No information available