CULLOMPTON UNITED CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
9 Almshouses within Cullompton, Community House and land left to the Charities. Gifts in Need to members of the Parish of CULLOMPTON, either individual, groups, nursery fees, help with assisted transport with the Car Voluntary Scheme of Cullompton. Many Piper lifelines for the elderly. George Spicer Fund with help of a grant of -+-ª100 towards tools or books for appentices/ students.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

9 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Devon
Governance
- 18 February 1998: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mary HEARD | Chair | 22 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Cheyenne Matthews | Trustee | 10 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
BEE GOFF | Trustee | 01 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Nderitu | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HARRIS | Trustee | 20 March 2011 |
|
|
||||
REV EDWARD HOBBS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PETER LABDON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BRIAN MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
TERESA CUMMINGS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £113.33k | £93.32k | £132.89k | £95.17k | £105.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £130.74k | £76.73k | £107.95k | £104.26k | £70.23k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 December 2023
(These accounts |
17 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 01 November 2023 | 1 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 November 2020 | 16 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 7 SEPTEMBER 1982
Charitable objects
1. THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF ALMSHOUSES FOR POOR PERSONS WHO ARE NOT LESS THAN 50 YEARS OF AGE RESIDENT IN THE ANCIENT PARISH OF CULLOMPTON. 2. FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ALMSHOUSES. 3. TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. 4. TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT INT THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF CULLOMPTON
Linked charities
- 18 February 1998 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 Celandines
St. Georges Well
CULLOMPTON
Devon
EX15 1AT
- Phone:
- 0188432166
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window