TILEHURST POOR'S LAND CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Financial support by grants to those in need, hardship or distress within the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Reading
- West Berkshire
Governance
- 11 April 1962: Standard registration
- Tilehurst People's Local Charity (Working name)
- POOR'S LAND (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
COLIN ROBERT CAIRNS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Veronica Warren Helen Bessie Manghnani | Trustee | 17 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
DENNIS GEORGE HAYDEN | Trustee | 21 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
SANDRA DOREEN VICKERS | Trustee | 22 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev'd Dr Liz Ratcliffe | Trustee | 24 September 2018 |
|
|||||
MRS SUE BAKER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MR GILES WINTER | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.81k | £20.15k | £20.34k | £19.53k | £24.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.10k | £14.50k | £19.50k | £26.97k | £10.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 30 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 28 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 14 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 4TH MAY 1982 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 5TH MARCH 1985 as amended on 08 Nov 2022 as amended on 23 Nov 2022
Charitable objects
RELIEVING EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
BOROUGH OF READING AND THE PARISHES OF THEALE AND TILEHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
PO Box 2802
Tilehurst
Reading
RG30 4GE
- Phone:
- 07386607936
- Email:
- clerk@tplc.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window