WILLIAM KEYTE COW CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Pays a small annual cash donation to local households nominated by the committee, taking their circumstances into account.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Other Charitable Activities
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 12 March 1962: Standard registration
- WILLIAM KEYTE (Previous name)
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Canon Dana Delap | Trustee | 27 November 2023 |
|
|||||||||||
Alice Chapman | Trustee | 02 December 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||
SIMON JONATHAN DRINKWATER | Trustee | 30 November 2015 |
|
|
||||||||||
DAVID WOODWARD | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
JEAN STANLEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PETER BANTON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||||||||
PEARL MITCHELL | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £99 | £78 | £104 | £165 | £212 | |
|
Total expenditure | £200 | £200 | £200 | £180 | £200 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 26 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 19 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 04 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 08 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
WILL DATED 31ST MAY 8 CAR 1. SCHEMES OF THE 12TH JUNE 1888, AND 16TH MARCH 1954
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE POOR OF THE ANCIENT PARISH OF EBRINGTON.
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF EBRINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
6 Keyts Acre
Ebrington
Chipping Campden
GL55 6PD
- Phone:
- 01386593446
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window