EARLE'S RETREAT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouse with individual flats where elderly people can live independently.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 February 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cornwall
Governance
- 13 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Homes England
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Paul Hobson | Chair | 19 September 2017 |
|
|||||
Ian Arthur Symonds | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
PHILIP HAGGAR | Trustee | 26 January 2023 |
|
|||||
Anne Rosemary Tredget | Trustee | 19 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barrie Lukey | Trustee | 17 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Martin Winchester | Trustee | 21 January 2014 |
|
|
||||
HAZEL CLAIRE EVANS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/02/2020 | 05/02/2021 | 05/02/2022 | 05/02/2023 | 05/02/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.53k | £98.35k | £98.79k | £135.42k | £162.22k | |
|
Total expenditure | £73.70k | £71.86k | £70.16k | £111.83k | £137.28k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2024 | 18 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 February 2023 | 22 January 2024 | 48 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2023 | 22 January 2024 | 48 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2022 | 01 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2021 | 23 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 February 2020 | 05 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 26TH SEPTEMBER 1958. U.R. 250 P. 461, AS AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 27 AUGUST 2003 AS AMENDED ON 20 MAR 2018
Charitable objects
ALMSHOUSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF POOR PERSONS OF NOT LESS THAN 55 YEARS OF AGE OF GOOD CHARACTER.
Area of benefit
THE PARISHES OF FALMOUTH, BUDDOCK, PENRHYN, MAWNAN AND MYLOR.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Earle's Retreat
Trelawney Road
Falmouth
Cornwall
TR11 3NG
- Phone:
- 01326 316087
- Email:
- earlesretreatclerk@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window