NEW CHARITY ESTATE

Charity Number: 204172
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Annual grant to senior Citizens

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024

Total income: £1,080
Total expenditure: £0

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Northamptonshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 April 1962: Standard registration
  • 19 January 1995: Removed
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • NEW ESTATE CHARITY (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kathryn Elizabeth Dodington Trustee 06 May 2025
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Peter John Brough Trustee 29 October 2024
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Julie Holland Trustee 16 January 2020
SHUTLANGER VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Rev Richard Stainer Trustee 07 November 2019
TRUST PROPERTY IN CONNECTION WITH THE CHURCH AND TOWN LANDS, ALDERTON, NORTHAMPTONSHIRE
Received: On time
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Michael Spurrell Trustee 07 November 2019
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Trevor Ian Morley Trustee 19 November 2013
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
Richard Jenkins Trustee 19 November 2013
CHARITY OF THOMAS BOSENHOE
Received: On time
SHUTLANGER VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £540 £297 £1.08k £132.19k £1.08k
Total expenditure £1.22k £1.21k £1.92k £566 £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 January 2024 29 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2023 16 January 2024 47 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2023 16 January 2024 47 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 January 2022 03 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2021 30 July 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 January 2020 21 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 January 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CHARITY REMOVED BY SECTION 74 RESOLUTION UNDER CHARITIES ACT 1993 PRINTED REPORTS 14 PAGE 223 SCHEME OF 23 DECEMBER 1932
Charitable objects
FOR THE PROVISION OF BREAD FOR THE POOR AFTER DIVINE SERVICE.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF STOKE BRUERNE AND SHUTLANGER
Registration history
  • 03 April 1962 : Standard registration
  • 19 January 1995 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
HEATHFIELD
BRIDGE ROAD
STOKE BRUERNE
TOWCESTER
NN12 7SE
Phone:
01604 862053
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available