Trustees CHALICE WELL TRUST

Charity number: 204206
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Marion van Eupen Trustee 11 November 2024
THE CHALICE WELL TRUST
Received: On time
Lindsay Smith Trustee 29 July 2024
None on record
tom bree Trustee 25 January 2024
THE CHALICE WELL TRUST
Received: On time
Alison Scobie Trustee 11 September 2020
THE CHALICE WELL TRUST
Received: On time
SOPHIA KNOCK Trustee 30 June 2016
None on record
Peter Derbyshire Trustee
SOMERSET BEEKEEPERS ASSOCIATION
Recently registered
JOANNA LAXTON Trustee
None on record