THE NICHOLLS HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Community based activities. e.g Bistro Nights, Dances, Produce Market, Badminton & Table Tennis, Jumble Sales. Hire of rooms for, Committee meetings, private functions e.g weddings, parties, used by local school for concerts, soft play area & local Post Office also local interest clubs. Hired for VIA entertainers.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Devon
Governance
- 05 April 1962: Standard registration
- THE NICHOLL'S HALL (Previous name)
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jayne Ellen Leigh-Tyler | Chair | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Danielle Jayne Fitze | Trustee | 13 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Hill | Trustee | 15 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sheelagh McGechan | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Ann Lenton | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Brenda Bridget Weller | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Michelle Brendon | Trustee | 31 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Payne | Trustee | 15 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Pamela Ann Hulett | Trustee | 09 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
MICHAEL ERIC CROCKER | Trustee | 01 April 2017 |
|
|||||
JERRY LOCK | Trustee | 01 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | 31/10/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.75k | £2.45k | £5.55k | £8.25k | £14.78k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.11k | £4.64k | £6.04k | £7.10k | £14.88k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £10.00k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2024 | 05 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 02 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 31 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 18 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 29 October 2021 | 59 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24 DECEMBER 1930 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 30 JUNE 1986 AND SCHEME DATED 5 MARCH 2002.
Charitable objects
THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF A HALL FOR PHYSICAL AND MENTAL RECEATION AND SOCIAL, MORAL AND INTELLUCTUAL DEVELOMENT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
LYDFORD AND IMMEDIATE VICINITY
Linked charities
- 05 April 1962 : Standard registration
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Nicholls Hall
Lydford
OKEHAMPTON
Devon
EX20 4BH
- Phone:
- 07988664895
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window