MARSHFIELD CONSOLIDATED CHARITIES

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Almshouses providing affordable accommodation for local elderly people
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 March 1962: Standard registration
- THE ALMSHOUSES (Working name)
- Homes England
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
RODNEY ARTINGSTALL | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Andrew Mervyn Pierce | Trustee | 05 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Paul Benjamin Spencer White | Trustee | 18 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Rev Sally Wheeler | Trustee | 24 March 2014 |
|
|||||
SUSAN CAROLINE WATKINS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JILLIAN RUTH DOWN | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DIANA MARY HAMMOND | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £38.95k | £39.61k | £41.78k | £95.47k | £49.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.41k | £35.50k | £29.61k | £29.14k | £81.66k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.82k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 19 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 01 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 17 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEMES OF THE 20TH MAY 1913, 26TH SEPTEMBER 1916 AND 19TH JUNE 1959 as amended on 05 Mar 2018
Charitable objects
1)THE COST OF REPAIRS AND INSURANCE,AND ALL OTHER CHARGES AND OUTGOINGS PAYABLE IN RESPECT OF THE PROPERTY OF THE CHARITIES,AND ALL THE PROPER COSTS,CHARGES,AND EXPENSES OF AND INCIDENTAL TO THE ADMINISTRATION AND MANAGEMENT OF THE CHARITIES,SHALL BE FIRST DEFRAYED BY THE TRUSTEES OUT OF THE INCOME THEREOF 2)THE TRUSTEES SHALL OUT OF THE SAID INCOME APPLY A YEARLY SUM OF ú5 IN FORMING A FUND FOR APPRENTICING A DESERVING AND NECESSITOUS BOY RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF MARSHFIELD 3)SUBJECT TO THE PAYMENTS AFORESAID THE TRUSTEES SHALL APPLY THE INCOME OF THE CHARITIES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE ALMSPEOPLE OF THE CHARITIES OR ANY OF THEM IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT FROM TIME TO TIME
Area of benefit
MARSHFIELD
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BACK LANE
MARSHFIELD
CHIPPENHAM
SN14 8NQ
- Phone:
- 01225891541
- Email:
- jnkilner@outlook.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window