Financial history BERKELEY PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 204334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £9.58k £9.59k £11.38k £12.52k £8.97k
Total expenditure £3.02k £2.75k £5.60k £6.01k £4.95k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A