Trustees BERKELEY PAROCHIAL TRUST

Charity Number: 204334
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Ellie Gent Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Frank Birnie Trustee 10 May 2024
None on record
HEATHER PRIESTLEY Trustee 10 May 2023
None on record
Gareth Langdon Trustee 20 March 2023
HAM AND STONE GREENS
Received: On time
STONE WITH WOODFORD PLAYGROUP AND TODDLERS
Received: On time
Susan Angus Trustee 13 March 2023
STONE VILLAGE HALL
Received: On time
BERKELEY GRAMMAR SCHOOL EDUCATIONAL FUND
Received: On time
Rev Steve Godsall Trustee 10 May 2022
None on record
Isaac Bamfield Trustee 21 June 2021
None on record
JUDITH CAROLE LE RICHE Trustee 05 February 2019
None on record