Financial history T.H.RUSSELL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 204340
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/10/2020 31/10/2021 31/10/2022 31/10/2023 31/10/2024
Total gross income £128.72k £154.64k £170.58k £196.26k £198.52k
Total expenditure £113.05k £190.63k £134.95k £121.89k £135.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A