Accounts and annual returns THE CLEVEDON HOSPITAL OUT-PATIENTS SAMARITAN FUND

Charity number: 204414
Charity reporting is overdue by 1642 days
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 181 days
Annual return 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 547 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 547 days
Annual return 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 912 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 912 days
Annual return 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1277 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1277 days
Annual return 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1642 days
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 1642 days