The Poland Trust

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of housing accommodation for those living within the area of benefit; provision and maintenance of amenity land to be used for recreation; making grants or providing goods, services or facilities to relieve beneficiaries who are in need, hardship or distress; making grants for the general benefit of inhabitants of the area of benefit.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 June 2024
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Amateur Sport
- Elderly/old People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Surrey
Governance
- POLAND HOUSE (Working name)
- SIDNEY MICHAEL POLAND FOR HOME AND RECREATION GROUND (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sidney Michael Poland Trustees Ltd | Trustee | 26 February 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/06/2020 | 30/06/2021 | 30/06/2022 | 30/06/2023 | 30/06/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £88.39k | £75.20k | £899.18k | £1.11m | £231.89k | |
|
Total expenditure | £98.63k | £100.87k | £219.76k | £239.17k | £207.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £760.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | N/A | £1.60k | £761.52k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £885.89k | £117.37k | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | N/A | £0 | £760.82k | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | N/A | £11.69k | £10.45k | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £224.68k | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | N/A | £216.37k | £236.73k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | £3.38k | £2.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | N/A | £7.28k | £31.99k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | N/A | £0 | £1.00k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | N/A | £3.38k | £2.45k | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | N/A | £0 | £0 | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2024 | 31 March 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2023 | 30 April 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2021 | 05 April 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 June 2020 | 08 March 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 26/01/01 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 12 JUNE 2006 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 19 OCTOBER 2006 as amended on 07 Feb 2019 as amended on 07 Feb 2019 as amended on 12 May 2021 as amended on 04 May 2022 as amended on 13 Jul 2022
Charitable objects
1A) THE PROVISION OF HOUSING ACCOMMODATION FOR BENEFICIARIES; AND B) SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE RESIDENTS OF THE ACCOMMODATION AS THE TRUSTEES DECIDE; AND C) IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE, TO IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS BY THE PROVISION AND MAINTENANCE OF AMENITY LAND TO BE USED FOR RECREATION. D) THE RELIEF OF BENEFICIARIES WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS. THE TRUSTEES MAY RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED BY I) MAKING GRANTS TO THEM; OR II) PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES FOR THEM; OR III) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY TO OTHER PERSONS OR BODIES WHO PROVIDE GOODS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES TO THOSE IN NEED; AND WITH PRIORITY TO BE GIVEN TO THE OBJECTS STATED IN SUB CLAUSES A B AND C ABOVE. IF AND IN SO FAR AS THE INCOME OF THE CHARITY CAN NOT BE APPLIED TOWARDS THE OBJECTS IN SUB-CLAUSE 1(A) TO (D) ABOVE, IT MAY BE APPLIED FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE TRUSTEES THINK FIT.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF BROCKHAM, BETCHWORTH, LEIGH AND BUCKLAND.
Linked charities
- 27 March 1962 : Standard registration
- 13 February 2001 : Removed
- 13 February 2001 : Asset transfer out
Contact information
- Address:
-
Albion Cottage
Wheelers Lane
Brockham
BETCHWORTH
Surrey
RH3 7LA
- Phone:
- 01737843632
- Email:
- warden@thepolandtrust.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window