Financial history WOOBURN SCRUBLAND CHARITY

Charity number: 204435
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/01/2020 31/01/2021 31/01/2022 31/01/2023 31/01/2024
Total gross income £17.77k £17.87k £18.45k £18.22k £19.38k
Total expenditure £15.76k £15.28k £19.99k £17.19k £18.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A