THE BONAKER CONVALESCENT CHARITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity makes grants to persons experiencing or recovering from physical or mental ill health, to aid in their recovery or help improve their everyday lives. Requests and grants must be made via another agency, eg. social care services, health services, hospices etc. There is no direct contact between the trustees and individuals awarded grants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Worcestershire
Governance
- 28 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martin Leeder | Chair | 04 July 2016 |
|
|
||||
Miriam Hartill | Trustee | 15 January 2025 |
|
|
||||
Jan Leeder | Trustee | 31 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Pauline Saunders | Trustee | 14 May 2021 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.62k | £1.51k | £1.50k | £1.53k | £1.54k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.90k | £1.34k | £895 | £728 | £1.82k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 November 2022 | 5 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 04 November 2021 | 4 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 21 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 16TH MARCH 1956
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE SICK POOR OF THE AREA OF THE COUNTY OF WORCESTER AND ADJACENT PARTS OF ADJOINING COUNTIES.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Lower Drive
Besford
WORCESTER
WR8 9AH
- Phone:
- 07985604433
- Email:
- Bonakersecretary@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window