ORTON WATERVILLE VILLAGE HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a hall for social, recreational and educational meetings for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish of Orton Waterville and its vicinity.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Peterborough City
Governance
- 18 March 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN COLYER HUCKLESBY | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Lesley Rands | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Fenton | Trustee | 16 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
MAUREEN ANN GOODYEAR | Trustee | 19 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Trevor Charles Rouse | Trustee | 20 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Christine Tulloch | Trustee | 07 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sandra Bradshaw | Trustee | 23 July 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £21.01k | £24.47k | £17.71k | £24.34k | £25.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £15.82k | £7.46k | £17.79k | £18.20k | £25.19k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £20.54k | £950 | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 19 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 14 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 17 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 09 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1.6.1949 as amended on 19 Jul 2023
Charitable objects
FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT AND RECREATION OF THE INHABITANTS OF ORTON WATERVILLE
Area of benefit
THE PARISH OF ORTON WATERVILLE
Contact information
- Address:
-
14 BATHURST
ORTON GOLDHAY
PETERBOROUGH
PE2 5QH
- Phone:
- 07739904156
- Email:
- MAUREEN.GOODYEAR@LIVE.CO.UK
- Website:
-
ortonwatervillevillagehall.wordpress.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window