THE GLASTONBURY PILGRIMAGE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise an annual pilgrimage to Glastonbury Abbey in order that pilgrims may continue to bear witness to the Catholic faith received by the Church of England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 July 2024
People

2 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
Governance
- 04 January 1967: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 22 September 2009: Standard registration
- 09 February 2011: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 May 2012: Re-registered
- GLASTONBURY PILGRIMAGE ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE WEST OF ENGLAND PILGRIMAGE ASSOCIATION (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
2 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
BISHOP PAUL THOMAS | Chair | 28 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
CANON STEVEN KIRK | Trustee | 14 November 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/07/2020 | 31/07/2021 | 31/07/2022 | 31/07/2023 | 31/07/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.49k | £931 | £8.67k | £8.22k | £13.99k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.21k | £1.49k | £7.76k | £12.19k | £9.90k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 July 2024 | 06 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2021 | 22 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 July 2020 | 23 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 July 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION AMENDED THE 7TH MARCH 1970 AS AMENDED 11TH OCTOBER 1986
Charitable objects
1. TO PROCLAIM BY WORD AND DEED THE TRUTH OF THE CATHOLIC RELIGION RECEIVED AND MAINTAINED BY THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND. 2. TO ARRANGE AT LEAST ONE ANNUAL PILGRIMAGE TO ONE OR OTHER OF THE HALLOWED SITES IN THE WEST COUNTRY. 3. TO MAKE REPARATION FOR THE LOSS AND DESTRUCTION OF THE MONASTIC AND OTHER RELIGIOUS FOUNDATIONS OF THIS LAND, AND TO SUPPORT PROJECTS FOR THE RESTORATION OF ANCIENT MONASTIC BUILDINGS PARTICULARLY THOSE IN GLASTONBURY. 4. TO DECLARE AND DEEPEN A SENSE OF SOLIDARITY OF MIND AND HEART AND WILL WITH THOSE WHO LIVED AND WORSHIPPED AT THESE SITES IN PAST CENTURIES.
Area of benefit
WEST COUNTRY
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Mill Head
Worton
DEVIZES
Wiltshire
SN10 5SJ
- Phone:
- 01380722948
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window