EDITH STRAIN (NURSING)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Grants to people with medical problems living in Wotton-under-Edge and to Organisations that support people living in Wotton-under-Edge
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 01 May 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Paying staff
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Karen Dover | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joan Deveney | Trustee | 24 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
Joyce Isidora Woodward-Hughes | Trustee | 03 June 2023 |
|
|
||||
PAULINE CLARE LATIMER | Trustee | 30 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
Diana Margaret Hyam | Trustee | 03 July 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jane Wallace | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mary Irma Downs | Trustee | 29 January 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.28k | £3.35k | £3.46k | £3.57k | £3.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.79k | £2.96k | £2.93k | £3.90k | £4.27k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 20 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 22 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 10TH AUGUST 1973 AS AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 25TH JULY 1988
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE IN CASES OF NEED PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE WHO ARE SICK, CONVALESCENT, DISABLED, HANDICAPPED OR INFIRM.
Area of benefit
WOOTON-UNDER-EDGE
Contact information
- Address:
-
Kilarney House
26 Long Street
WOTTON-UNDER-EDGE
Gloucestershire
GL12 7BT
- Phone:
- 01453845376
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window