PLYMOUTH DEAF ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
1.TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES ON A NON-DISCRIMINATORY BASIS WHERE DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE CAN COME TOGETHER. 2.TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE LIVING IN PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Plymouth City
Governance
- 09 May 1962: Standard registration
- PLYMOUTH DEAF ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- BLAKE LODGE CENTRE FOR THE DEAF (Previous name)
- PLYMOUTH AND DISTRICT MISSION AND INSTITUTE FOR THE DEAF AND DUMB (Previous name)
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Robert Rickard | Trustee | 12 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tommy Thurogood | Trustee | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Joseph Neale | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mark Cunliffe | Trustee | 24 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Catherine Gillespie | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Michael Kelly | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Paul Andrew Northam | Trustee | 24 October 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £20.43k | £5.25k | £0 | £2.37k | £8.40k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.10k | £4.00k | £2.53k | £7.83k | £4.00k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 30 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 29 January 2024 | 363 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 29 January 2024 | 728 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 01 February 2021 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 28TH FEBRUARY 1966 AS AMENDED 30TH MAY 1977 AND 16 JULY 2005.
Charitable objects
1. TO PROVIDE A MEETING PLACE FOR DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE OF ALL AGES ON A NON-DISCRIMINATORY BASIS WHERE DEAF AND HEARING PEOPLE CAN COME TOGETHER. 2. TO PROMOTE THE WELFARE OF DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE LIVING IN PLYMOUTH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA. 3. TO ORGANISE AND ENCOURAGE ALL SUITABLE FORMS OF SOCIAL ACTIVITIES FOR CLUB MEMBERS OF ALL AGES AND THEIR FAMILIES TO IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE. 4. TO WORK IN PARTNERSHIP WITH OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO IMPROVE SERVICES AVAILABLE TO DEAF AND HEARING IMPAIRED PEOPLE. 5. TO PROVIDE SERVICES OF CHRISTIAN WORSHIP IN BRITISH SIGN LANGUAGE. 6. TO ENCOURAGE KNOWLEDGE AND APPRECIATION OF DEAF CULTURE, DEAF AWARENESS, EQUAL RIGHTS AND LEGAL MATTERS SUCH AS THE DISABILITY DISCRIMINATION ACT, BOTH TO MEMBERS AND THE LOCAL COMMUNITY. 7. TO RAISE FUNDS FOR THE AFORESAID PURPOSES AND FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF THE CLUB BUILDINGS.
Area of benefit
15 MILES RADIUS OF THE PLYMOUTH CITY CENTRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
24 Butts Park
Newton Ferrers
PLYMOUTH
Devon
PL8 1HY
- Phone:
- 07766073925
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window