Financial history CHURCH LANDS

Charity number: 204639
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £1.53k £1.23k £1.83k £2.30k £2.50k
Total expenditure £2.71k £1.43k £6.87k £2.02k £1.81k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A