HOBSON'S CONDUIT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE MAINTENANCE OF HOBSON'S BROOK
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

11 Trustee(s)
20 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 18 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
John Arthur Latham | Chair | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Dr Timothy Hugh Johnson | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Nicholas James Acklam | Trustee | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Amyas Phillips | Trustee | 17 February 2021 |
|
|
||||
Roger Andrew Thornton | Trustee | 14 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
ELISABETH HANNAH WHITTLE | Trustee | 18 April 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Robert Carne King | Trustee | 09 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Carl Tatterton | Trustee | 01 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Kenneth Kington | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
Max Field | Trustee | 27 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DR STEVEN BOREHAM | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £32.15k | £46.27k | £47.37k | £55.65k | £163.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £21.42k | £31.00k | £78.04k | £76.66k | £79.45k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £22.93k | £13.05k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 10 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 11 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 14/04/1899 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/10/2013 as amended on 02 Dec 2020
Charitable objects
FOR THE MAINTENANCE OF HOBSON'S BROOK.
Area of benefit
COUNTY BOROUGH OF CAMBRIDGE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
26 Highfield Avenue
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2AL
- Phone:
- 07918685160
- Website:
-
hobsonsconduittrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window