BRISTOL CHARITIES
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2005
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
- North Somerset
- South Gloucestershire
Governance
- BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.53m | £2.51m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.13m | £1.99m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2004 | 31/03/2005 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | N/A | |
|
Other assets | N/A | N/A | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | N/A | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | 03 November 2005 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 03 October 2005 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 20 April 2005 | 79 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 31 January 2005 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS, AMENDED BY SCHEME DATED 29/04/2005
Charitable objects
SEE INDIVIDUAL CONSTITUENTS.
Area of benefit
UNLESS OTHERWISE STATED BRISTOL AND DISTRICT.
Linked charities
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR WIDOWS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S CHARITY FOR POOR WOMEN IN CHILDBED(BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN JOHN WHITSON'S NON-EDUCATIONAL CHARITIES
- ALDERMAN JOSEPH JACKSON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALDERMAN ROBERT KITCHEN
- ALICE COLE FOR POOR HOUSEHOLDERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ALICE COLE FOR POOR OF PARISH OF ST JAMES BRISTOL (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- BRISTOL CHARITIES SERVICES
- BRISTOL GUILD OF THE HANDICAPPED TRUST
- BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES' RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
- BRISTOL RELIEF IN SICKNESS AND NURSES CHARITY
- DAME SARAH HABERFIELD (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- DR CHARLES SLOPER
- DR GEORGE OWEN
- DR THOMAS WHITE FOR MARRIAGE PORTIONS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDITH LOUISA GARLICK (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDMUND LANE (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- EDWARD PHILIPS TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ELIZABETH ASH (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- FRANCIS FULLER (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- GEORGE HARRINGTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- GROVE HOUSE HOME FUND
- GUARDIAN HOUSE CHARITY
- HENRY HERBERT WILLS ANNUITY TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- HUMPHREY BROWN FOR POOR OF PARISH OF IRON ACTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- HUMPHREY BROWN FOR POOR OF PARISH OF WESTBURY-ON-TRYM (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- JAMES YEADON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- JOHN MERLOTT'S CHARITY FOR THE BLIND (WITH SUBSIDIARY ENDOWMENTS)
- JOHN PEARCE'S GIFT
- LEIR FUND
- MARGARET EDGAR (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR FREEMEN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR LYING IN WOMEN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY ANN PELOQUIN FOR POOR OF ST STEPHEN'S (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY BECK (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MARY CARPENTER MEMORIAL
- MISS ANN CASAMAJOR
- MISS ELIZABETH LUDLOW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS ELLEN MARRIOTT (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS HANNAH LUDLOW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MISS HANNAH MARRIOTT (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MRS ANN THURSTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- MRS CATHERINE MARY CASTLE'S TRUST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- ORCHARD HOMES
- PERRETT'S HOMES
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S ESSEX ESTATES
- REVEREND DR THOMAS WHITE'S GRAY'S INN LANE TRUST
- RICHARD HUGHES
- RICHARD REYNOLDS
- RICHARD REYNOLDS (II) CHARITY
- SAILORS COLLEGE PENSION CHARITY (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- SAMUEL GIST (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- SION HOSPITAL (BRISTOL) CHARITY
- SIR ABRAHAM ELTON (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THE AUGUSTUS PHILLIPS FOUNDATION (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED
- THE BRISTOL DISPENSARY AND RELIEF IN SICKNESS CHARITY
- THE SOLDIERS' CORNER IN ARNOS VALE CEMETERY
- THOMAS BONVILLE FOR POOR HOUSEKEEPERS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS BONVILLE FOR POOR RESIDENTS (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS CHESTER'S CHARITY FOR ALMSPEOPLE
- THOMAS GIRLING MEMORIAL FUND
- THOMAS HOLBIN (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- THOMAS WHITE
- W C F BLACKMORE'S GIFT
- W C H BISHOP MEMORIAL FUND
- WEBB'S HOME TRUST
- WHITSON'S LYING IN CHARITY (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- WILLIAM BARROW (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- WILLIAM EMMETT HABGOOD (BRISTOL MUNICIPAL CHARITIES FOR RELIEF IN NEED)
- 27 April 1962 : Standard registration
- 10 October 2005 : Removed
- 10 October 2005 : Asset transfer out
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window