CHARITY OF RICHARD BELCHER

Charity Number: 204666
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Giving grants to individuals and organisations involved in the education and training of young people or involved in religious activities.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024

Total income: £8,925
Total expenditure: £3,000

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 26 April 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • RICHARD BELCHER'S CHARITY (NON-EDUCATIONAL) (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

11 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Georgina Felicia Bondzi-Simpson MBE Chair 01 September 2024
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
ALL SAINTS METHODIST CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Lynnette Beatrice Seymour-Jackson Trustee 09 November 2023
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Carolyn Beynon Hawkes Trustee 21 November 2021
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Ian Paul Brawn Trustee 21 November 2021
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Neil Dennis Oastler Trustee 19 January 2021
VILLAGE HALL KINGSTON BAGPUIZE
Received: On time
WANTAGE AND ABINGDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Kenneth Michael Stuart Townsend Trustee 19 January 2021
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Heather Katherine Townsend Trustee 19 January 2021
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Alastair Charles Fear Trustee 17 November 2019
Abingdon Town ABC Gym Fund Distribution Trust
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
DEACON SELINA JANE NISBETT Trustee 17 November 2016
WANTAGE AND ABINGDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
CYNTHIA DOROTHY BARTLETT Trustee 15 November 2015
THE BICESTER SCHOOL TRUST FUND
Received: On time
WANTAGE AND ABINGDON METHODIST CIRCUIT
Received: On time
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time
Dr THOMAS WILLIAM KYFFIN Trustee 15 November 2015
TRINITY CHURCH ABINGDON
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £2.70k £5.51k £1.83k £2.21k £8.93k
Total expenditure £0 £0 £7.50k £0 £3.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2024 06 November 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2023 29 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2022 07 November 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 10 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Trinity Church
Conduit Road
ABINGDON
OX14 1DB
Phone:
01235520282
Email:
No information available
Website:

trinityabingdon.org.uk