Accounts and annual returns THE HARRY BOTTOM CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 204675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 30 June 2024 22 April 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2024

(These accounts
have been qualified)

22 April 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2023 05 April 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2023 05 April 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2022 23 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2022 23 December 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2021 08 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2021 08 February 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 June 2020 01 February 2021 On Time Download Open in new window