GODMANCHESTER CHARITIES

Charity number: 204703
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Relief for residents of the Ancient Parish of Godmanchester in conditions of need, hardship or distress. Assisting persons under the age of 25 years, resident in Godmanchester who are preparing for or entering into a profession, trade or occupation to provide them with outfits, tools, payment of fees etc. Promoting the education of such persons.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £893
Total expenditure: £1,293

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Cambridgeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 October 1985: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

7 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Alan Peter HOOKER Chair 07 May 2023
HELEN ASHTON CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev Daniel Marc BECKETT Trustee 15 March 2023
None on record
OLWYN HURD Trustee 17 February 2021
HELEN ASHTON CHARITY
Received: On time
Canon JONATHAN PRIESTLAND YOUNG Trustee 01 January 2017
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF ST MARY THE VIRGIN, GODMANCHESTER
Received: On time
HELEN ASHTON CHARITY
Received: On time
MALCOLM COHEN Trustee 06 September 2011
HELEN ASHTON CHARITY
Received: On time
Rev DAVID WESTLY BUSK Trustee
HUNTINGDON AREA MONEY ADVICE
Received: On time
HELEN ASHTON CHARITY
Received: On time
THE CHURCH CHARITY
Received: On time
ANN MARION LOOKER Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £626 £1.07k £906 £1.92k £893
Total expenditure £880 £1.19k £393 £390 £1.29k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 July 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 03 July 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 13 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 November 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 21 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29 OCTOBER 1985
Charitable objects
A)ASSISTING PERSONS UNDER 25 RESIDENT IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO ARE IN NEED OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE AND WHO ARE PREPARING FOR,ENTERING UPON OR ENGAGED IN ANY PROFESSION,TRADE,OCCUPATION OR SERVICE,BY PROVIDING THEM WITH OUTFITS,OR BY PAYING FEES,TRAVELLING EXPENSES,OR BY SUCH OTHER MEANS FOR THEIR ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE B)IN OTHERWISE PROMOTING THE EDUCATION OF SUCH PERSONS. (PRIOR TO SCHEME OF 29 OCTOBER 1985 REGISTERED UNDER 204703.)
Area of benefit
ANCIENT PARISH OF GODMANCHESTER
Registration history
  • 29 October 1985 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
9 Allen Farm Close
Godmanchester
HUNTINGDON
PE29 2LT
Phone:
07990541441
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available