Financial history PLUMLEY'S ELEEMOSYNARY CHARITY

Charity Number: 204725
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 30/11/2022 30/11/2023 30/11/2024
Total gross income £563 £712 £562 £718 £560
Total expenditure £545 £580 £710 £568 £602
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A