Accounts and annual returns CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY

Charity number: 204757
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not submitted
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2022 12 September 2022 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2021 19 November 2021 On Time
Annual return 29 February 2020 16 November 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2020 16 November 2020 On Time