Governing document CAMBRIDGE ROYAL ALBERT BENEVOLENT SOCIETY
Charity number: 204757
Removed charity
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
RULES AND REGULATION OF THE SOCIETY ESTABLISHED MARCH 1846 AS AMENDED 16TH NOVEMBER AND 21ST JULY 1981 AND 16TH MAY 1990 AND 21 MAY 1996, 15 OCTOBER 2002 AND 16 MAY 2006
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A HOME FOR AGED AND INFIRM PERSONS WHO ARE RESIDENTS OF, OR WHO HAVE CLOSE ASSOCIATIONS WITH, THE CITY OF CAMBRIDGE
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
NOT DEFINED
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.