TOWN HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This Town Hall is for the benefit of the inhabitants of the parish
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £6,500 from 1 government grant(s)
People

1 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 30 April 1962: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WATLINGTON TOWN HALL TRUSTEE BODY | Trustee | 08 May 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.66k | £26.61k | £24.32k | £16.54k | £15.86k | |
|
Total expenditure | £17.31k | £17.91k | £15.09k | £19.50k | £25.96k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £7.56k | £9.91k | £9.79k | N/A | £6.50k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 03 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 20 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 07 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 19 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF 6TH FEBRUARY 1917.
Charitable objects
BUILDING FOR THE BENEIFT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PARISH
Area of benefit
PARISH OF WATLINGTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Old School Place
Watlington
OX49 5QH
- Phone:
- 01491613867
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window