LOCKINGE AND ARDINGTON RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 204770
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To help people of all ages in Ardington and Lockinge who are having difficulties. Help is given when assistance from Government sources is not possible or not adequate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £6,358
Total expenditure: £4,048

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Oxfordshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 22 February 1962: Standard registration
  • 20 August 1997: Removed (Ceased to exist)
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • ALLOTMENT LAND (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Investment
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
THOMAS CHRISTOPHER LOYD Chair
VILLAGE HOUSING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
WANTAGE CARE CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Rev John Durant Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Mark Parry Trustee 17 July 2024
None on record
Paul Gibbs Trustee 21 July 2021
None on record
Margaret Ann East Trustee 10 July 2019
None on record
CHARLES MONTGOMERY MERRY Trustee 24 September 2012
VILLAGE HOUSING CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
RON EAST Trustee
None on record
TERENCE WELCH Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.51k £5.59k £5.69k £5.97k £6.36k
Total expenditure £4.63k £5.09k £4.22k £3.87k £4.05k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 28 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 11 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 12 December 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 16 August 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 10 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF 29 NOVEMBER 1983 AS AMENDED 17 APRIL 1997 BY RESOLUTION PASSED UNDER SECTION 74 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993
Charitable objects
FOR THE RELIEF EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY OF PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISHES OF ARDINGTON AND LOCKINGE WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY OR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES CALCULATED TO REDUCE THE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS OF SUCH PERSONS.
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF LOCKINGE AND ARDINGTON
Registration history
  • 22 February 1962 : Standard registration
  • 20 August 1997 : Removed

Contact information

Address:
LOCKINGE & ARDINGTON
RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY
LOCKINGE ESTATE OFFICE
ARDINGTON
WANTAGE, OXFORDSHIRE
OX12 8PP
Phone:
01235833200
Website:

No information available