GROOME TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
This charity was set up to provide resident's of Brockenhurst assistance. We provide lifelines. We donate to local community run groups and organisations. At Christmas we provide vouchers from from a local store to families and personal gifts to the elderly who are now living in care homes. We provide financial assistance to individuals who may need help i.e. purchasing walking aides.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
- Hampshire
Governance
- 08 May 1962: Standard registration
- RESIDENCE FOR DISTRICT NURSE AND OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM JOHN OTTER | Trustee | 01 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Helen Margaret Mantle | Trustee | 10 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Clare Louise Robbins | Trustee | 01 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kirsty Bladen | Trustee | 03 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Dunkinson | Trustee | 10 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £7.57k | £6.62k | £6.96k | £7.46k | £7.59k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.77k | £5.51k | £8.06k | £8.37k | £7.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 21 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 26 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 02 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 19 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 07 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONVEYANCE 22ND NOVEMBER 1929 AND DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 2ND DECEMBER 1929 AND SCHEME OF 17TH FEBRUARY 1969
Charitable objects
GENERAL CHARITABLE PURPOSES.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF BROCKENHURST
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 Carrington Lane
Milford On Sea
LYMINGTON
Hampshire
SO41 0RB
- Phone:
- 07803267665
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window