RUDHAM COTTAGERS CLUB
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
GENERAL SOCIAL ACTIVITIES INCLUDING MONTHLY MEETINGS AND EXCURSIONS FOR RESIDENTS( OVER 60S) OF THE RUDHAMS AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Services
- Norfolk
Governance
- 30 March 1962: Standard registration
- 09 July 2013: Removed (Voluntary removal)
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2008 | 31/12/2009 | 31/12/2010 | 31/12/2011 | 31/12/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.60k | £1.69k | £1.51k | £1.27k | £1.67k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.35k | £2.23k | £2.03k | £1.59k | £2.25k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2012 | 21 March 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2012 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2011 | 25 April 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2011 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2010 | 22 March 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2010 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2009 | 25 February 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2009 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 24TH OCTOBER 1961
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A CLUB FOR THE USE AND BENEFIT OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN EAST AND WEST RUDHAM IN THE COUNTY OF NORFOLK, AND TO PURSUE ANY OBJECTS NOW OR HEREAFTER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE MEMBERS OF THE CLUB.
Area of benefit
EAST RUDHAM WEST RUDHAM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.