OKEWOOD, FOREST GREEN AND OCKLEY AID IN SICKNESS FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Aid sick, aged - generally local people with a need, particularly with travel expenses to and from hospital. Small purchases of items to add comfort to those in need. Distribution of funds at Christmas time. Donations to local surgery toward medical items needed, plus sums to local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

6 Trustee(s)
1 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 December 1963: Standard registration
- AID-IN-SICKNESS FUND (Working name)
- OKEWOOD & DISTRICT NURSING ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- THE NURSING ASSOCIATION (Working name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SUSAN ELIZABETH GIBBS | Chair | 16 July 2012 |
|
|
||||
Susan Standen | Trustee | 10 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Hon Gillian Mary Christie | Trustee | 05 October 2021 |
|
|||||
Elizabeth Anne Coleman | Trustee | 17 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Susan Dixon | Trustee | 05 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
JANE MARGARET WAUGH | Trustee | 19 May 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.75k | £20.20k | £20.60k | £21.31k | £22.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.28k | £20.92k | £28.26k | £8.98k | £21.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 05 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 11 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 03 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 07 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 25 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME OF THE 18TH APRIL 1963
Charitable objects
FOR THE BENEFIT EITHER OF THE SICK POOR OF THE AREA OF AREA OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF OKEWOOD,THAT PART OF THE PARISH OF ABINGER WHICH IS KNOWN AS FOREST GREEN,AND THE PARISH OF OCKLEY,ALL IN THE COUNTY OF SURREYGENERALLY, OR OF SUCH SICK POOR PERSONS RESIDENT THEREIN AS THE TRUSTEES SELECT.
Area of benefit
SEE OBJECTS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Copse Barn
Ockley Road
Forest Green
DORKING
RH5 5SQ
- Phone:
- 01306621440
- Email:
- seg@wickland.plus.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.