THE TOWN ESTATE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Relief of poverty to people living in the Parish of Fenstanton
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 19 December 1969: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Martyn Crawshaw | Trustee | 12 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kelly Ann Smith | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Peter Schonfeldt | Trustee | 18 July 2022 |
|
|
||||
GREGORY JOHN HARLOCK | Trustee | 10 December 2018 |
|
|
||||
JEAN DING | Trustee | 03 July 2013 |
|
|
||||
SYDNEY BARNETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
IVOR DENNIS GORMAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.71k | £1.62k | £3.82k | £3.19k | £3.12k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.10k | £1.22k | £1.54k | £1.35k | £1.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 22 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 25 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 20 July 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 24 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
INCLOSURE AWARDS 1802 AND 3 SEE P.R. 24 PAGE 94 AND ORDERS DATED 1ST DECEMBER 1896 AND 1907
Charitable objects
GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE PARISH.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF FENSTANTON
Contact information
- Address:
-
10 Conington Road
Fenstanton
HUNTINGDON
Cambridgeshire
PE28 9LB
- Phone:
- 07902 900417
- Email:
- janet@vacfrance.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window