AGE CONCERN DORCHESTER
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the wellbeing of all older people in the area and to make later life an enjoyable and fulfilling experience. * By providing direct services to enable older people to remain independent and enjoying life * By working with older people to campaign and have their voices heard.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2015
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Dorset
Governance
- 04 May 1962: Standard registration
- 06 August 2015: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 06 August 2015: Funds transferred to 1142519 AGE UK DORCHESTER LTD
- DORCHESTER AND DISTRICT OLD PEOPLES' WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- DORCHESTER OLD PEOPLES' WELFARE COMMITTEE (Previous name)
- ROWAN COTTAGE (Previous name)
- ROWAN COTTAGE (AFFILIATED TO AGE CONCERN) (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 31/03/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £321.10k | £231.63k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.45k | £221.45k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | 31 July 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 04 August 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 19 September 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 09 October 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 09 October 2012 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 15/5/92 AMENDED 30 MAY 1997, 18 JUNE 1998 AND 3 JULY 2003
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE RELIEF OF ELDERLY PEOPLE IN ANY MANNER WHICH NOW IS OR HEREAFTER MAY BE DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
IN AND AROUND DORCHESTER.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window