LOVELACE COTTAGES

Charity Number: 204978
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provision of 2 almshouses for benefit of widows of parish

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024

Total income: £15,247
Total expenditure: £2,242

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Surrey

Governance

Registration history:
  • 08 May 1962: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
REV HUGH MASSEY GREAR Chair 24 February 2016
None on record
Aidan Charles Barwick Clegg Trustee 11 February 2025
None on record
Jane Melissa Abigail Cochran Trustee 06 June 2023
None on record
Angus Nicol Jordan Trustee 17 November 2021
None on record
Helen Jefferies Trustee 01 January 2017
OCKHAM PARISH ROOM
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £4.30k £7.77k £12.80k £13.97k £15.25k
Total expenditure £44.96k £46.93k £7.12k £1.48k £2.24k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2024 05 March 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2023 08 February 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 25 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 21 February 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 12 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Alms Heath Cottage
Alms Heath
Ockham
WOKING
GU23 6NZ
Phone:
01483224475
Website:

not.applicable