SMART AND HUMBLE HOMES

Charity Number: 205035
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Provides affordable housing for elderley people of the parishes of Hutton Buscel, Wykeham, Ruston and West Ayton

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £10,026
Total expenditure: £9,111

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Accommodation/housing
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • North Yorkshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 28 February 1963: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • GEORGE EDWARD SMART FOR ALMSHOUSES (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Homes England
Policies:
  • Investment
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Shirley Cooke Trustee 19 September 2016
None on record
MARY THERESA GIBSON Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.42k £9.34k £10.42k £10.47k £10.03k
Total expenditure £5.80k £5.34k £5.44k £4.43k £9.11k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 17 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 31 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 08 April 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 07 March 2022 127 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 19 August 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
GEORGE STANLEY HOUSE
2 WEST PARADE ROAD
SCARBOROUGH
YO12 5ED
Phone:
01723863395
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available