CALNE RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 205038
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

For the assistance and relief of those who need help with clothing, household goods or the payment of small amounts of money, to provide immediate aid, particularly for children or the elderly.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,971
Total expenditure: £6,747

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
Where the charity operates:
  • Wiltshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 14 November 1978: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • CALNE WELFARE CHARITIES (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rachael Clayden Trustee 11 March 2025
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Earl of Kerry Simon Henry George Petty-Fitzmaurice Trustee 08 March 2024
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
WILTSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
WILTSHIRE ARCHAEOLOGICAL AND NATURAL HISTORY SOCIETY
Received: On time
Rev Caspar James Barnard Bush Trustee 24 September 2023
THE SIR JOHN AND LADY BODINNAR'S TRUST
Received: On time
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF CALNE AND BLACKLAND
Received: On time
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
Jessica Pillow Trustee 21 December 2011
MAUD HEATH'S TRUST
Received: On time
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
DEIRDRE ALDOUS Trustee 21 December 2011
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
JONATHAN BILLINGS Trustee
CALNE ADVANCEMENT IN LIFE CHARITY
Received: On time
CALNE ALMSHOUSE CHARITY
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £3.29k £4.30k £3.21k £10.82k £4.97k
Total expenditure £4.47k £4.62k £6.56k £9.59k £6.75k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 13 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 29 March 2024 58 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 08 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 08 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 09 February 2021 9 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
1 Amberley Close
Calne
SN11 9UP
Phone:
01249822994