Financial history EVESHAM RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY

Charity number: 205074
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £5.92k £5.51k £5.20k £7.05k £7.03k
Total expenditure £6.21k £3.05k £7.08k £5.32k £9.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A