Financial history POWICK UNITED CHARITIES

Charity Number: 205090
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 05/04/2020 05/04/2021 05/04/2022 05/04/2023 05/04/2024
Total gross income £691 £738 £683 £696 £696
Total expenditure £412 £1.38k £1.15k £538 £1.06k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A