FULLERTON PENSION CHARITY
Charity number: 205136
Removed charity
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
What, who, how, where
What the charity does:
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
- Elderly/old People
How the charity helps:
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Other Finance
Where the charity operates:
- Surrey
Governance
Registration history:
- 22 May 1962: Standard registration
- 09 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
Organisation type:
Other names:
No other names
Gift aid:
No information available
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
No policies declared
Land and property:
No information available
Financial history
No financial information provided for the past 5 financial periods
Accounts and annual returns
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2008 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2007 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2006 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2004 | Not submitted |
Governing document
Details of the type of governing document the charity has and when it was established.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DEED POLL DATED 27 NOVEMBER 1817 AMENDED BY SCHEME OF 6 JULY 1923
Charitable objects
6 PENSIONS FOR MAINTENANCE OF THE INFIRM AND AGED POOR 3 FOR WIDOWS AND 3 FOR MEN (PENSIONERS SHOULD BE MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND AND OVER THE AGE OF 60)
Area of benefit
The area the charity can operate in, as set out in its governing document.
ANCIENT PARISH OF WEST HORSLEY
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Was this page useful?
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window