TAYLER BLACKALL FUND

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity is for the benefit of the whole of the parish of Great Haseley either as individuals or the community. Individuals can apply for grants for support, for example supporting events in sporting, cultural, artistic endeavours.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Oxfordshire
Governance
- 24 January 1974: Standard registration
- GREAT HASELEY RELIEF IN NEED CHARITY (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
REV SIMON NICHOLAS CRONK | Chair | 29 October 2015 |
|
|||||
William George Meadon | Trustee | 12 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katie Stringer | Trustee | 22 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
MRS J E SIMCOX | Trustee | 08 November 2017 |
|
|
||||
JANE ROSEMARY CANNON | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
FIONA MUNRO HEYWARD | Trustee | 01 November 2016 |
|
|
||||
Mr Ben Spencer | Trustee | 08 March 2016 |
|
|
||||
MRS M A HOWLETT | Trustee | 29 October 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.02k | £1.03k | £1.08k | £4.74k | £1.17k | |
|
Total expenditure | £560 | £980 | £635 | £3.39k | £675 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 18 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 02 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 11 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME DATED 24/01/1974 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28/06/1994 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2012
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE EITHER GENERALLY OF INDIVIDUALLY PERSONS RESIDENT IN THE PARISH OF GREAT HASELEY WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
PARISH OF GREAT HASELEY
Contact information
- Address:
-
62 Latchford Lane
Great Haseley
OXFORD
OX44 7LE
- Phone:
- 01844279631
- Email:
- JANE@JANEANDDAVID.CO.UK
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window